IL HB0281 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that "redevelopment project costs" include costs payable to businesses located within the redevelopment area that have experienced business interruption or other adverse conditions directly or indirectly attributable to the COVID-19 public health emergency. Provides that the costs may be reimbursed in the form of grants, subsidies, or loans and that the municipality may establish procedures for the payment of such costs, including application procedures, grant or loan agreements, certifications, payment methodologies, and other accountability measures that may be imposed upon participating businesses. Defines "costs of business interruption".
Title
TIF-REDEVELOPMENT PROJECT COST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=281&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0281.htm |