IL HB0279 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that an oral drug is misbranded if gluten is included as an inactive ingredient and is not so listed on its label. Provides that the provisions do not apply to pharmacies or pharmacists.
Title
DRUG LABELING-GLUTEN
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0121 |
2021-07-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |