IL HB0278 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides in various provisions an exemption to carry a firearm on Department of Natural Resources property in accordance with the Firearm Concealed Carry Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE CD-FIREARM EXEMPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.11Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.33Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.34Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback