IL HB0278 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, from February 1, 2017 through January 31, 2018, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 8.5% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.355% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, from February 1, 2018 through January 31, 2019, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 9% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.57% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, from February 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 9.5% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.785% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, beginning on February 1, 2020, the Treasurer shall transfer each month from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund an amount equal to 10% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, estates, and corporations during the preceding month. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LGDF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2018 |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-047-000 |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |