IL HB0277 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, for taxable year 2017 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation is $75,000 (currently, $55,000). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=277&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0277.htm |