IL HB0277 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, for taxable year 2017 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation is $75,000 (currently, $55,000). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback