IL HB0276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System to persons who became participants before the effective date of the amendatory Act and provides that, beginning on that date, the System shall not accept any new participants. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-GARS-LIMIT MEMBERSHIP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-03HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4052-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback