IL HB0275 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the Downstate Police Article, allows an officer under that Article to establish optional credit for up to 5 years of service as a participant under the Chicago Police Article if the officer (i) was certified under the law governing the certification of police officers at the time the service was rendered, (ii) applies in writing on or before December 31, 2023, (iii) supplies satisfactory evidence of the employment, (iv) completes 10 years of contributing service under the Downstate Police Article, and (v) makes specified contributions to the fund. In the Chicago Municipal Article, provides that unless the performance of an act or acts of duty results solely in the death of the employee, a compensation annuity or supplemental annuity shall not be paid. Provides that the death of any employee as a result of the exposure to and contraction of COVID-19, as evidenced by either (i) a confirmed positive laboratory test for COVID-19 or COVID-19 antibodies or (ii) a confirmed diagnosis of COVID-19 from a licensed medical professional, shall be rebuttably presumed to have been contracted while in the performance of an act or acts of duty and the employee shall be rebuttably presumed to have been fatally injured while in active service. Provides that the presumption shall apply to any employee who was exposed to and contracted COVID-19 on or after March 9, 2020 and on or before June 30, 2021. Provides that the presumption shall not apply if the employee was on a leave of absence from his or her employment or otherwise not required to report for duty at the physical work space generally assigned to the employee, including, but not limited to, working remotely, for a period of 14 or more consecutive days immediately prior to the date of contraction of COVID-19. Makes other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0342 |
2021-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-07-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-16 | House | House Concurs |
2021-06-16 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-06-16 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-06-15 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-06-15 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martwick |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martwick |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-040-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-151.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |