IL HB0274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
Pending: House Health Care Licenses Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that "practice of pharmacy" includes the prescribing and dispensing of hormonal contraceptive patches and self-administered oral hormonal contraceptives. Defines "hormonal contraceptive patch" as a transdermal patch applied to the skin of a patient, by the patient or by a practitioner, that releases a drug composed of a combination of hormones that is approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration to prevent pregnancy and "self-administered oral hormonal contraceptive" as a drug composed of a combination of hormones that is approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration to prevent pregnancy and that the patient to whom the drug is prescribed may take orally. Allows pharmacists to prescribe and dispense contraceptives to a person over 18 years of age and a person under 18 years of age only if the person has evidence of a previous prescription from a primary care or a women's health care practitioner. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to adopt rules to establish standard procedures for pharmacists to prescribe contraceptives. Provides requirements for the rules to be adopted by the Department. Provides that all State and federal laws governing insurance coverage of contraceptive drugs and products shall apply to the provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY-BIRTH CONTROL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-006-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-29HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258519.7New CodeSee Bill Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback