IL HB0271 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, all handgun ammunition that is manufactured, imported into the State for sale or personal use, kept for sale, offered or exposed for sale, sold, given, lent, or possessed shall be serialized. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, any person who manufactures, causes to be manufactured, imports into the State for sale or personal use, keeps for sale, offers or exposes for sale, or who gives or lends any handgun ammunition that is not serialized is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, any person who possesses in any public place any handgun ammunition that is not serialized is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor. Provides exceptions. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, the Department of State Police shall maintain a centralized registry of all reports of handgun ammunition transactions reported to the Department in a manner prescribed by the Department. Provides that information in the registry, upon proper application for that information, shall be furnished to peace officers and authorized employees of the Department of State Police or to the person listed in the registry as the owner of the particular handgun ammunition. Provides that the Department of State Police shall adopt rules relating to the assessment and collection of end-user fees in an amount not to exceed $0.005 per round of handgun ammunition or per bullet, in which the accumulated fee amount may not exceed the cost to pay for the infrastructure, implementation, operational, enforcement, and future development costs of these provisions. Effective January 1, 2019, except some provisions effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-HANDGUN AMMO-SERIALIZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-28HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-0.05New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.10New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.11New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.12New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback