IL HB0271 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions concerning elections, sets forth the procedure for placing specified candidates on the ballot for the general municipal election. Provides that if one officer is to be elected, then the 2 candidates who receive the highest number of votes shall be placed on the ballot for the next succeeding general municipal election. If 2 aldermen are to be elected at large, then the 4 candidates who receive the highest number of votes shall be placed on the ballot. If 3 aldermen are to be elected at large, then the 6 candidates who receive the highest number of votes shall be placed on the ballot. Provides that the name of a write-in candidate may not be placed on the ballot for the general municipal election unless he or she (i) receives a number of votes in the primary election that equals or exceeds the number of signatures required on a petition for nomination for that office or (ii) receives a number of votes in the primary election that exceeds the number of votes received by at least one of the candidates whose names were printed on the primary ballot for nomination for or election to the same office. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-ELECTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=271&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0271.htm |