IL HB0269 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - To Property Tax Subcommittee
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension to the 47th year (currently, the 35th year) for the redevelopment project areas that were established on December 29, 1986 and January 23, 1991 by the City of East St. Louis. Requires adoption of an ordinance extending the completion date and providing notice to the taxing bodies that would otherwise constitute the joint review board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-EAST ST LOUIS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback