IL HB0269 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Permits a single commissioner to approve of enforcement actions under provisions of the Act concerning insuring an employer's ability to pay compensation, replacing the current requirement of a panel of 3 commissioners. Permits the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission to, if an employer's business is declared to be extra hazardous, issue a work-stop order while awaiting a ruling from the Commission or while awaiting proof of insurance by the employer. Provides that investigative actions must be acted upon within 90 days of the issuance of a complaint. Raises the maximum allowable penalty for noncompliance with certain insurance requirements from $2,000 to $10,000. Doubles the maximum allowable penalties, to $1,000 per day, with a minimum penalty of $20,000, for employers found to be in noncompliance more than once. Provides that an employer with 2 or more violations may no longer self-insure or purchase an insurance policy from a private broker for one year or until all penalties are paid, during which time the employer must purchase insurance from the Assigned Risk Pool through the National Council on Compensation Insurance.
Title
WORKERS' COMP-ABILITY TO PAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0040 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 104-010-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-01 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |