IL HB0269 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides for the waiver of tuition assessed by a school district on children whose parents are unable to afford them. With respect to summer school, provides that a school board must (instead of may) waive all or part of summer school charges if it determines that the family of a pupil is indigent or the educational needs of the pupil require his or her attendance. Amends the Chicago School District Article to provide that the summer kindergarten provisions are subject to the waiver of fees and tuition provisions. Requires the Chicago Board of Education, during that period of the calendar year not embraced within the regular school term, to provide and conduct courses in subject matters normally embraced in the program of the schools during the regular school term, fix and collect a charge for attendance at such courses in an amount not to exceed the per capita cost of the operation thereof, except that the board must waive all or part of such charges if it determines that the family of an individual pupil is indigent or that the educational needs of the pupil require his or her attendance at such courses, and give regular school credit for satisfactory completion by the student of such courses as may be approved for credit by the State Board of Education.
Title
SCH CD-SUMMER SCHOOL-NO CHARGE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-22 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.33A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.27a | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-21.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=269&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0269.htm |