IL HB0266 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Guardians For Adults With Disabilities Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a guardian shall consider the ward's current preferences to the extent the ward has the ability to participate in decision making when those preferences are known or reasonably ascertainable by the guardian. Provides that decisions by the guardian shall conform to the ward's current preferences unless the guardian reasonably believes that doing so would result in substantial harm to the ward's welfare or personal or financial interests. Provides that if the guardian is unable to ascertain the ward's preferences, then the decisions may be made by conforming as closely as possible to what the ward would have done or intended under the circumstances. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE-GUARDIAN-DECISIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-06HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0258
2021-08-06HouseEffective Date August 6, 2021
2021-08-06HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2021-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-29HouseArrived in House
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-04-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-03-02HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
2021-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755511a-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=266&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0266.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0266eng.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0266enr.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0258.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0266sam001.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB0266_04162021_011018T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB0266_04162021_011018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200HB0266_05292021_011013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB0266sam001_05312021_013000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback