IL HB0263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that persons shall not be determined ineligible for cash assistance provided under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program based upon a conviction for any drug-related felony under State or federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-ELIGIBILITY-DRUG OFFENSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-006-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback