IL HB0262 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Increases the minimum wage to $15 per hour on October 1, 2017. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MIN WAGE-$15 PER HOUR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-03HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-03HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-21HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback