IL HB0260 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that until July 1, 2023, images from cameras are exempt from disclosure. Amends the Expressway Camera Act. Provides that the program conducted by the Illinois State Police, the Illinois Department of Transportation, and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to increase the amount of cameras along the expressways in Cook County shall also increase cameras along Jean-Baptiste Pointe DuSable Lake Shore Drive. Requires details about the program objectives, counties where the program is operational, and policies under which the program operates to be made publicly available and posted online within 90 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency may use images from an expressway camera to investigate vehicular hijacking, aggravated vehicular hijacking, terrorism, motor vehicle theft, or any forcible felony, including, but not limited to, offenses involving the use of a firearm (instead of only an offense involving the use of a firearm) and to detect highway conditions and facilitate highway safety and incident management. Adds provisions concerning retention of images from cameras, reporting requirements, and prosecutorial jurisdiction. Relocates the definition of "expressway" and defines terms. Changes the Act repeal date to July 1, 2025 (instead of July 1, 2023). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DIGITAL LICENSE STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1042 |
2022-06-03 | House | Effective Date June 3, 2022 |
2022-06-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 097-010-002 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-012-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Feigenholtz |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-001-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |