IL HB0254 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Transactions Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an owner or any other person engaging in a real estate transaction to engage or participate in certain actions or behavior, including actions or behavior related to transactions, terms, offers, negotiations, representations, publications of intent, and listings, because of a person's criminal conviction history.
Title
HUMAN RTS-CRIMINAL CONVICTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 3-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=254&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0254.htm |