IL HB0254 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than January 31, 2021, and annually thereafter, the State Board of Education must make available on its website information about actively employed teachers within each school district, pupil-teacher ratios for each school district, class instructors by grade level and subject in each school district, and class size in each school; defines terms. Requires each school district to report the information required for the State Board's report no later November 16, 2021, and annually thereafter, and also make that information available on its website.
Title
SCH CD-CLASS SIZE GOALS
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0451 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 086-032-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-012-001 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Peters |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-003-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-003-000 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 084-030-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-003-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.136a | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |