IL HB0252 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that "employer" includes any person employing one (instead of 15) or more employees within Illinois during 20 or more calendar weeks within the calendar year of or preceding the alleged violation. Provides that "employer" does not include any place of worship with respect to the employment of individuals of a particular religion to perform work connected with the carrying on by the place of worship of its activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUM RIGHTS-EMPLOYER-DEFINITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0430
2019-08-20HouseEffective Date July 1, 2020
2019-08-20HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 076-041-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-018-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 011-006-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-13SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77552-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback