IL HB0251 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the notice of application for judgment and sale may be mailed by first-class mail (currently, registered or certified mail). Provides that the envelope containing the notice shall be clearly marked "Notice of Judgment and Sale of Unpaid Property Taxes". Removes a requirement that the county collector must present proof of the mailing to the court along with the application for judgement.
Title
PROP TAX-TAX SALE NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=251&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0251.htm |