IL HB0247 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, but exempts from the amendatory provision a contract with a Certified Driver Rehabilitation Specialist. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DAILY PUPIL ATTENDANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 82 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0450 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 082-035-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-004-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-002-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-002-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-034-001 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-004-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-13 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 433 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-19.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13B-50.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.66b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 29-6.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |