IL HB0246 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Landscape Architecture Registration Act. Provides that no person shall use the title "registered landscape architect" or "landscape architect" without being registered by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Creates the Registered Landscape Architecture Registration Board. Provides for the membership, meetings, and powers of the Board. Provides that the Department may seek the expert advice and knowledge of the Board on any matter relating to the enforcement of the Act, including qualifications of applicants for registration. Provides that the Department may issue certificates of registration to those who meet the requirements of the Act. Provides that the Department may authorize examinations to ascertain the fitness and qualifications of applicants for registration. Provides that the Department may conduct investigations and hearings to refuse to issue, renew, or restore registrations, revoke, suspend, place on probation, or reprimand persons registered under provisions of the Act. Provides that the Department may take disciplinary action with regard to any certificate of registration issued under the Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Park District Code, the Chicago Park District Act, the Professional Geologist Licensing Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to repeal the Landscape Architecture Registration Act on January 1, 2032.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-03-03HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2021-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22574520Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text
7012058-50Amended CodeCitation Text
70150526.10-4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback