IL HB0245 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "mobile carrying device". Provides that a mobile carrying device may be operated on a sidewalk or crosswalk so long as it is operated in accordance with local ordinances, a personal property owner is actively monitoring its operation and navigation, and it is equipped with a braking system that enables it to perform a controlled stop. Prohibits a personal property owner operating a mobile carrying device from failing to comply with traffic or pedestrian control devices and signals, unreasonably interfering with pedestrians or traffic, transporting hazardous materials, or operating on a street or highway other than in a crosswalk. Provides that a mobile carrying device has the rights and obligations applicable to a pedestrian in the same circumstances, except that it shall yield the right-of-way to pedestrians on a sidewalk or crosswalk. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-MOBILE CARRYING DEVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0123 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-006-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-144.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1412.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |