IL HB0244 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code, the Counties Code, and the Clerks of Courts Act. Makes changes to provisions concerning base salaries or awards and stipends paid to supervisors of assessments, county treasurers, county coroners, county recorders, county auditors, sheriffs, and clerks of the circuit court to provide that such officials, whose terms of office begin on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act: (1) shall receive their base salary plus not more than 6% (rather than 12%) of base salary in counties with a population of 100,000 or more but less than 400,000; (2) shall receive 50% of specified State awards or stipends in counties with a population of 100,000 or more but less than 400,000; and (3) shall receive no award or stipend in counties with a population of 400,000 or more. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV-REDUCE STIPENDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-10007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-6001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-6002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-6003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-8002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=244&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0244.htm |