IL HB0242 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lead in Schools Reporting Act. Provides that on an annual basis the Department of Public Health, in coordination with local departments of public health serving the City of Chicago, shall conduct specified lead testing at public school facilities within the City. Provides that the results from such testing shall be transmitted to the State Board of Education. Provides that the Department shall notify the Board if a detected lead level meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Amends the School Code. Provides that school report cards for cities with populations in excess of 500,000 shall include lead testing results and that students in such districts may transfer from one attendance center to another attendance center within or outside of the district if any lead levels at his or her current attendance center meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Makes other changes to provisions concerning transfers to specified attendance centers.
Title
SCH REPORT CARD-LEAD-CHICAGO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-08 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-01 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=242&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0242.htm |