IL HB0241 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires each geographically organized service region operating under the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health to submit by July 1 of each year, beginning in 2018, an annual foster care mental health service plan to the Department that details the service array, from prevention to crisis services, available to Medicaid-eligible children and youth in foster care. Sets forth the data and information the service plans shall contain, including: (1) the number of Medicaid-eligible children and youth in foster care who are served in the region's service area each year; (2) details on the types of mental health services provided to children and youth in foster care and their families, which may include, but are not limited to, screenings, assessments, home-based mental health services, outpatient services, day treatment services, inpatient services, psychiatric hospitalizations, crisis interventions, case management, or psychotropic medication support services; and (3) medication monitoring consistent with any child welfare psychotropic medication measures developed by the Department of Children and Family Services and any Healthcare Effectiveness Data and Information Set (HEDIS) measures related to psychotropic medications. Requires the Department of Human Services to (i) post each foster care mental health service plan on its Internet website in a manner that is publicly accessible and (ii) share performance outcome system data with the regional administrator of each service region for the purpose of informing foster care mental health service plans.
Title
DHS-FOSTER CARE-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=241&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0241.htm |