IL HB0240 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a person with a valid concealed carry license issued under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act, or an off-duty law enforcement official or officer, may carry a handgun on or about his or her person while hunting. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUNTING-CARRYING HANDGUNS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-19HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2019-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-01-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-07HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback