IL HB0239 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Requires manufacturers of brand name or generic prescription drugs to notify State purchasers, health insurers, health care service plan providers, pharmacy benefit managers, and the General Assembly of specified increases in drug prices at least 60 days before such increase and the cost of specified new prescription drugs within 3 days after approval by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Provides that within 30 days after such notifications, prescription drug manufacturers shall report specified information to State purchasers, health insurers, health care service plan providers, pharmacy benefit managers, and the General Assembly. Provides that failure to report such information shall result in a specified civil penalty. Requires the General Assembly to conduct an annual public hearing on aggregate trends in prescription drug pricing. Provides that if the manufacturer of a prescription drug or its agent meets or otherwise communicates with a prescriber for the purpose of marketing a drug, then the manufacturer or its agent shall disclose to the prescriber if any ingredient in the drug it is marketing is known to pose a risk of dependency in humans. Makes other changes.
Title
DRUG MANUFACTURER-DISCLOSURES
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 620 | 16.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 620 | 16.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=239&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0239.htm |