IL HB0234 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, requires every public high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction on media literacy; sets forth what topics the unit of instruction shall include. Provides that the State Board of Education shall determine how to prepare and make available instructional resources and professional learning opportunities for educators that may be used for the development of the unit of instruction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MEDIA LITERACY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0055
2021-07-09HouseEffective Date July 9, 2021
2021-07-09HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-015-000
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Education; 011-002-000
2021-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-11SenateAssigned to Education
2021-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-21SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-21SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-044-000
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-009-000
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.08New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback