IL HB0234 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a licensed practical nurse's scope of practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-13HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256555-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback