IL HB0233 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 8 @ 9:00 am in Virtual Room 1 www.ilga.gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $3,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for English language learner support software for school district instruction. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ISBE-ENGLISH LEARNER SOFTWARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback