IL HB0231 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Changes definitions of "population" to be the total number of inhabitants according to the last preceding federal decennial census (rather than number of inhabitants or number of persons). Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Adds a definition of "population" in the general definition Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD & COUNTY CD-POPULATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-02-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5552-3001Amended CodeCitation Text
5556-31002Amended CodeCitation Text
6551-1-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback