IL HB0231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates President Barack Obama's date of birth, August 4, as a legal holiday on which to hold appropriate exercises in commemoration of him. Includes that when the day falls on a Sunday, the following Monday shall be held and considered the holiday. Amends the Election Code, the Illinois Procurement Code, the School Code, and the Promissory Note and Bank Holiday Act to include Barack Obama's birthday as a holiday. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE HOLIDAY-OBAMA BIRTHDAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-09HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
20563017Amended CodeCitation Text
3050015-45Amended CodeCitation Text
549061New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback