IL HB0230 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public University Uniform Admission Act. Requires each public university in this State to admit first-time freshman applicants as undergraduate students if the applicant graduated with a grade point average in the top 10% of the student's high school graduating class in one of the 2 school years preceding the academic year for which the applicant is applying for admission and (1) the applicant graduated from an accredited public or private high school in this State or from a high school operated by the United States Department of Defense; (2) the applicant successfully completed the minimum college preparatory curriculum requirements for admission to the university or satisfied the ACT's College Readiness Benchmarks on the ACT college admission assessment applicable to the applicant or earned on the SAT college admission assessment a score of at least 1,500 out of 2,400; and (3) if the applicant graduated from a high school operated by the United States Department of Defense, the applicant is a State resident or is entitled to pay tuition fees at the rate provided for State residents. Provides that the University of Illinois at Urbana-Champaign is not required to offer admission to applicants who qualify for automatic admission in excess of the number required to fill 75% of the university's enrollment capacity designated for first-time resident undergraduate students in an academic year. Sets forth other provisions concerning the University of Illinois at Urbana-Champaign. Sets forth other provisions concerning admissions. Provides for additional preparation for college, student outreach, and rulemaking.
Title
HIGHER ED-UNIFORM ADMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-007-000 |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-02-06 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-02-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-09 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |