IL HB0226 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes a State policeman to elect to establish eligible creditable service for up to 5 years of service as a full-time law enforcement officer employed by the federal government or by a state or local government located outside of Illinois for which credit is not held in any other public employee pension fund or retirement system. Provides that to obtain that credit, the applicant must file a written application with the Board no later than 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, accompanied by evidence of eligibility acceptable to the Board and payment of a specified amount to be determined by the Board. Excludes a benefit increase resulting from the amendatory Act from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-STATE POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | To Administrative and Substantive Pension Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=226&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0226.htm |