IL HB0220 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Modifies the definition of "supervisor" under the Act. Provides that in fire fighter units (rather than new fire fighter units), employees shall consist of fire fighters of the highest rank of company officer and below (currently, highest rank not specified). Provides that a company officer may be responsible for multiple companies or apparatus on a shift, multiple stations, or an entire shift. Provides that there may be more than one company officer per shift. Provides that all other ranks above that of the highest company officer shall be supervisors (currently, highest rank not specified).
Title
LABOR-FIRE FIGHTER SUPERVISOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0686 |
2021-12-17 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2022 |
2021-12-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-11-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-10-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-003-000 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 26, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-002-000 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Labor |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-019-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-006-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |