IL HB0220 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Wage Insurance Act. Establishes a wage insurance program to be administered by the Department of Employment Security. Provides that an individual is eligible for benefits if the individual is a claimant under the Unemployment Insurance Act at the time the individual obtains reemployment and is not employed by the employer from which the individual was last separated. Provides for benefits in an amount sufficient to pay the individual the difference between the wage the individual received at the time of separation from the employer by which the individual was employed immediately before becoming a claimant under the Unemployment Insurance Act and the wages received from reemployment. Imposes a 0.4% tax on payroll beginning January 1, 2020. Provides that claims may be made beginning July 1, 2020. Provides for recovery of erroneous payments, hearings, penalties, unpaid tax, rules, and other matters. Creates the Wage Insurance Fund, provides for the continuing appropriation from the Fund of amounts necessary for the purposes authorized by the Act, and amends the State Finance Act to include the Wage Insurance Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WAGE INSURANCE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseTo Wage Policy and Study Subcommittee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-28HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback