IL HB0217 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board may allow the motto "In God We Trust" to be displayed in a conspicuous location inside or outside each school building.
Title
SCH CD-IN GOD WE TRUST DISPLAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 115-002-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |