IL HB0214 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that death certificates and medical certifications shall be completed and signed by specified certifying health care professionals (rather than by the physician in charge). Defines "certifying health care professional" as a physician or advanced practice registered nurse. Defines "advanced practice registered nurse" as: (i) an advanced practice registered nurse with full practice authority; or (ii) an advanced practice registered nurse with a collaborative agreement with a physician who has delegated the completion of death certificates. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
VITAL RECORDS
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0257 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |