IL HB0208 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to award grants, subject to appropriation, to applicants who are teachers licensed under the School Code and are employed by a school district within an area designated as a poverty area by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to obtain additional course credit or an additional degree at a public university located in this State. Provides that the amount of the grant shall equal 50% of the tuition and other necessary fees required of the teacher by the public university at which the teacher enrolls. Requires grant recipients to contract with the Commission to teach for an additional 2 years in the school district in which they were employed at the time of application for the grant. Sets forth provisions concerning this commitment.
Title
HIGHER ED-GRANTS TO TEACHERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=208&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0208.htm |