IL HB0207 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires hospitals that receive a property tax exemption under a provision of the Property Tax Code concerning exemptions related to access to hospital and health care services by low-income and underserved individuals to post the hospital's charity care policy and the contact information of a financial counselor in a reasonably viewable area in the hospital's emergency room.
Title
HOSPITALS-POSTINGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-09 | House | Re-assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |