IL HB0206 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Housing Authorities Act. In a provision permitting a Housing Authority to refuse to certify or recertify applicants, current tenants, or other household members who have been convicted of a criminal offense relating to the sale or distribution of a controlled substance, provides that prior to refusing to certify or recertify such a person, the Authority shall make an individualized assessment and determine whether it is reasonable to conclude that the applicant, current tenant, or other household member would constitute a threat to those in the community where the applicant, current tenant, or other household member would reside; or whether it is reasonable to conclude that the applicant, current tenant, or other household member would otherwise engage in other unlawful activities in that community. Provides that during the individualized assessment, the Authority shall consider all mitigating circumstances, including, but not limited to: the nature of the crime; the time elapsed between the date of conviction and the date of certification or recertification; the applicant's, tenant's, or other household member's background; the incentive to litigate the criminal matter; and any evidence demonstrating rehabilitation. Requires the Authority to provide notice to the applicant, current tenant, or other household member that he or she may be denied certification or recertification because of a criminal conviction and that he or she has the right to an impartial hearing to demonstrate that he or she should not be denied certification or recertification because of his or her particular circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOUSING-CRIMINAL HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2020-06-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2020-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2020-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
2020-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2020-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2020-02-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2020-02-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-02-18HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-004-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-20HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3101025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback