IL HB0205 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Children's Mental Health Local Integrated Fund Act. Creates local children's mental health collaboratives. Defines "local children's mental health collaborative" as an entity formed by the agreement of representatives of the local system of care, including mental health services, social services, correctional services, education services, health services, and vocational services for the purpose of developing and governing an integrated service system. Provides that, to qualify as a local children's mental health collaborative and be eligible to receive start-up funds, the representatives of the local system of care and nongovernmental entities such as parents of children in the target population; parent and consumer organizations; community, civic, and religious organizations; private and nonprofit mental and physical health care providers; culturally specific organizations; local foundations; and businesses, or at a minimum one county, one school district or special education cooperative, one mental health entity, and one juvenile justice or corrections entity, must agree to the following: (1) to establish a local children's mental health collaborative and develop an integrated service system; (2) to commit resources to providing services through the local children's mental health collaborative; and (3) to develop a plan to contribute funds to the children's mental health collaborative.
Title
CHILD MENTAL HEALTH LOCAL FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-024-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-008-000 |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |