IL HB0205 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act to require the instruction on mental health and illness to evaluate the multiple dimensions of health by reviewing the relationship between physical and mental health so as to enhance student understanding, attitudes, and behaviors that promote health, well-being, and human dignity.
Title
SCH MENTAL HEALTH INSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-001 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-01-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |