IL HB0201 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment of Strikebreakers Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 30 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |