IL HB0198 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Labor Dispute Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-006-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 5 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |