IL HB0197 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Requires that at least one registered pharmacy technician be on duty whenever the practice of pharmacy is conducted. Requires that pharmacies fill no more than 10 prescriptions per hour. Requires 10 pharmacy technician hours per 100 prescriptions filled. Prohibits pharmacies from requiring pharmacists to participate in advertising or soliciting activities that may jeopardize patient health, safety, or welfare and any activities or external factors that interfere with the pharmacist's ability to provide appropriate professional services. Provides that a pharmacist shall receive specified break periods. Provides that a pharmacy may not require a pharmacist to work during a break period, shall make available a break room meeting specified requirements, shall keep a complete and accurate record of the break periods, and may not require a pharmacist to work more than 8 hours a workday. Provides for enforcement and penalties. Provides whistleblower protections for an employee of a pharmacy if the pharmacy retaliates against the employee for certain actions. Requires pharmacies to maintain a record of any errors in the receiving, filling, or dispensing of prescriptions.
Title
PHARMACY-PRESCRIPTION LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 85 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 15.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 85 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=197&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0197.htm |