IL HB0196 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term of an appointed trustee shall terminate immediately upon becoming a member of the system or being sworn into an elective State office, and the position shall be considered to be vacant. Provides that an elected trustee who is incumbent on the effective date of the amendatory Act whose status as a participating employee or annuitant has terminated after having been elected shall continue to serve in the participating employee or annuitant position to which he or she was elected for the remainder of the term. Provides that trustees shall continue in office until their respective successors are appointed and have qualified, except that a trustee elected (instead of appointed) to one of the participating employee (instead of participant) positions after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be disqualified immediately upon the termination of his or her status as a participating employee (instead of participant) and a trustee elected (instead of appointed) to one of the annuitant positions after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be disqualified immediately upon the termination of his or her status as an annuitant receiving a retirement annuity. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SURS-BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |